Description
Alternate History: Turkey (Without Islam)
Turkey | Republic of Turkey | Türkiye Respublikası (Turkish)
Capital: Bashkent
Largest city: Bashkent (16,993,896)
Official language: Turkish
Other languages: Avar, Chechen, Circassian, Kazakh, Kurdish, Kyrgyz, Persian, Uzbek
Ethnic groups: 68.2% Turk, 27.6% Uzbek, 16.5% Kazakh, 8.8% Tajik, 6.9% Kyrgyz, 7.8% Romani, 8.4% Circassian, 2.3% Chechen, 1.2% Kurd, 5.3% others
Religions: Alevism (78.1%), Mazdeism (8.2%), Vainakh (1.5%), Protestant Christianity (1.2%), Yazidism (1.1%), Catholic Christianity (1.0%), Others (3.1%), Non-religious (5.8%)
Demonym: Turkish
Government: Constitutional republic | Unitary presidential
President: Mengütegin ince
Prime Minister: Büyük Yıldırım
Legislature: Grand National Assembly
Republic declared: October 29, 1920
Area: 4,341,611 sq km
Population: 112,692,823
Currency: Turkish lira (TRY)
Internet TLD: .tr
Republic of Turkey (1920-1945)
Prime Ministers
Mikayil Kenan Atatürk 3 May 1920 – 24 Jan 1921 (People's Republic Party)
Fevzi Çakmak 24 Jan 1921 – 12 Jul 1922 (People's Republic Party)
Rauf Orbay 4 Nov 1922 – 4 Aug 1923 (People's Republic Party)
Ferhat Okyar 14 August 1923 – 23 October 1923 (People's Republic Party)
İstemi İnönü 1 Nov 1923 – 22 Nov 1924 (People's Republic Party)
Ferhat Okyar (2nd) 22 Nov 1924 – 3 Mar 1925 (People's Republic Party)
İstemi İnönü (2nd) 4 Mar 1925 – 25 Oct 1937 (People's Republic Party)
Celâl Bayar 25 Oct 1937 – 25 Jan 1939 (People's Republic Party)
Ragıp Başdağ 25 Jan 1939 – 7 Jul 1942 (People's Republic Party)
Alparslan Tüzer 7 July 1942 – 9 July 1942 (People's Republic Party)
Şükrü Saraçoğlu 9 Jul 1942 – 23 Feb 1945 (People's Republic Party)
People's Republic of Turkey (1945-1991)
Chairmen of the Council of Ministers
Yağız Baştürk 28 Feb 1945 – 3 Jul 1951 (People's Socialist Party of Turkey)
Serhan Büyük 3 Jul 1951 – 14 Dec 1958 (People's Socialist Party of Turkey)
Dündar Karatay 14 Dec 1958 – 13 Jun 1960 (People's Socialist Party of Turkey)
Bayram Özoğuz 13 Jun 1960 – 24 Dec 1969 (People's Socialist Party of Turkey)
Metin Aybar 24 Dec 1969 – 6 Jun 1974 (People's Socialist Party of Turkey)
Rüstem Kurt 6 Jun 1974 – 27 Apr 1983 (People's Socialist Party of Turkey)
Koray Gündoğan 27 Apr 1983 – 13 Dec 1985 (People's Socialist Party of Turkey)
Selçuk Özdemir 13 Dec 1985 – 16 Jun 1988 (People's Socialist Party of Turkey)
Metehan Keskin 16 Jun 1988 – 9 Nov 1989 (People's Socialist Party of Turkey)
Turgut Özal 9 Nov 1989 – 21 Dec 1989 (Motherland Party)
Republic of Turkey (since 1989)
Prime Ministers
Turgut Özal 21 Dec 1989 – 23 Jun 1991 (Motherland Party)
Merküt Yılmaz 23 Jun 1991 – 20 Nov 1991 (Motherland Party)
Bülent Ecevit 20 Nov 1991 – 25 June 1993 (Democratic People's Party)
Tansu Çiller 25 Jun 1993 – 6 Mar 1996 (Democratic People's Party)
Merküt Yılmaz 6 Mar 1996 – 11 Jan 1999 (Motherland Party)
Bülent Ecevit (2nd) 11 Jan 1999 – 18 Nov 2002 (Democratic People's Party)
Necdet Erbakan 18 Nov 2002 – 14 Mar 2003 (National Outlook Party)
Ragıp Erdoğan 14 Mar 2003 – 28 Aug 2014 (National Outlook Party)
Iskender Alpay Davutoğlu 28 Aug 2014 – 24 May 2016 (National Outlook Party)
Büyük Yıldırım 24 May 2016 – 24 Jun 2018 (National Outlook Party)
Mengütegin ince 24 Jun 2018 - Incumbent (People's Republic Party)
History of Turkey
PrehistoryAntiquityTauri and ScythiansBosporan Kingdom (438 BC – 370 AD)
High Middle Ages
Hun rule (370–470)Roman rule (470–581)Turkic Khaganate (552–744)Khazar Khaganate (618–1048)Great Bulgar Khanate (632–668)Kangar Union (659–750)Turgesh Khaganate (699–766)Kimek Khanate (743–1035)Oguz Khaganate (750–1055)Karluk Khaganate (756–940)Roman rule (833–1204)Karakhanian Khanate (840–1212)Pecheneg Khanates (860–1091)Cuman-Kipchak Confederation (900–1220)Khitan Empire (1124–1218)Great Seljuk Empire (1037–1194)Khwarazmian Empire (1077–1231)
Late Middle Ages
Mongol rule (1218–1259)Golden Horde (1240s–1446)Timurian Empire (1363–1507)Khanate of Crimea (1399–1453)Khanate of Sibir (1419–1498)Khanate of Kazan (1438–1552)Kazakh Khanate (1446–1487)
Modern period
Turkish Empire (1453-1920)First Republic (1920-1945)Communist Turkey (1945-1990)Second Republic (since 1990)
Demographics
Largest cities
Başkent
Kuban
Almaty
Taşkent
Akyar
Aşkabat
Taman
Astrahan
Akmoly
Samarkand
Eskişehir
Duşanbe
Bişkek
Şımkent
Mahaçkale
Nemengan
Şetkale
Taraz
Soçi
Aktöbe
Akmabet
Buhara
Öskemen
Andican
Sıvaş
Kafdağı
Alaşkale
Yalta
Korkunç
Nalçik
Çarcev
Nukus
Adıyaman
Daşoğuz
Oş
Karşı
Gölcük
Hokand
Uşak
Hucend
Çirçik
Fergana
Maykop
Beşdağ
Hasavyurt
Çerkeskale
Kırşehir
Derbent
Çeşane
Marı
Elista
Nazran
Acısu
Hazarşehir
Map is Me
Idea is Me
Link: www.amazon.com/World-Without-I… ( A World Wihout Islam )